+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- AGNR - Majority; do pass.
- AGNR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.