+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 13).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
1922-S AMH MOSC MUNN 407
ADOPTED 03/09/2013
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor