+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 146, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (SG 15).
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- SG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor