+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022*.
- Chapter 137, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HSRR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
On February 12, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 22). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2022 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- CYF - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor