+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).