+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 252, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate receded from amendments.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- CLS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (COG 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)