+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor