+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Commerce & Gaming.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- CLS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (COG 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)