+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance.
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor