+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor