+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LWD 13).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- LWD - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development.
+ − Amendment
1884-S AMH MANW TANG 031
FAILED 03/09/2013