+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor vetoed.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor