+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HE 13).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.