+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to House Rules.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Scheduled March 7, 2022 executive session in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM in anticipation of other legislative action. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.