+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to House Rules 3.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EET - Majority; do pass.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (TR 15).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (2)
1850-S2.E AMS KING S3026.1
ADOPTED 04/15/2015
1850-S2 AMH HAYE MURD 167
ADOPTED 03/10/2015
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor