+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor