+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (9)
Kilduff
Type:
Primary Sponsor