+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor