+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)