+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Chapter 30, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HLG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 5. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.