+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Executive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM failed. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor