+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 206, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments and floor amendment(s) also adopted.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services & Corrections.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ELHS 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- APP - Majority; do pass ELHS 13 bill proposed by Early Learning & Human Services.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
+ − Amendments (3)
1821-S AMS HSC S2393.1
ADOPTED 04/17/2013
1821-S AMS DARN S2699.1
ADOPTED 04/24/2013
1821-S AMS DARN S2631.1
ADOPTED 04/17/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor