+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAB - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 9:00 AM.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1821 AMH MANW ELGE 039
WITHDRAWN 03/10/2015