+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor