+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 17). (View 1st Substitute)
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor