+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 379, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Law & Justice.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Law & Justice.
- LBRC - Majority; without recommendation. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- COG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor