+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 417, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor