+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)