+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).