+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 170, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 7. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)