+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- ED - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendment
1770 AMH BERG WARG 166
ADOPTED 01/27/2016