+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- ITED - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)