+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 22). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor