+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 128, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 5. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HSEL 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor