+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 158, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HLTH - Majority; do pass.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 15).
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).