+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 3/4/2022.
- Chapter 3, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
On December 30, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor