+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On December 28, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.