+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
On December 28, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor