+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance.