+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- HE - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).