+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor