+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- APPH - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
- APPH - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Minority; do not pass.
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.