+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
- Chapter 264, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- Passed final passage; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Rules suspended.
- Senate receded from amendments.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- ENET - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ENVI 22). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2022 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. (View Original Bill)
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor