+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Chapter 169, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor