+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor