+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- LWD - Majority; do pass.
- LWD - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development.