+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 125, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)