+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor