+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (56)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/11/2020.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 13, 2020 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd substitute bill substituted (ED 20). (View 3rd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- ED - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 3rd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor