+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 124, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- HSA - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- HSEL - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor